SOUTH BUCKS HOSPICE

Charity number: 1128881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CAROLINE ALEXIA LANGLEY Trustee 27 September 2018 None on record
ALAN HARRY CHANDLER Trustee None on record
DAVID RICHARD ELLIS Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Philip James Watkins Trustee 09 November 2016 None on record
MR BARRY PICKERSGILL Trustee None on record
David Balls Trustee 08 June 2016 None on record
SNEHAL RABHERU Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
JOANNA LYNDEN KERRIDGE Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record