Financial history THE INSPIRE AND ACHIEVE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £223.31k £371.38k £482.94k £438.19k £853.03k
Total expenditure £215.41k £336.77k £454.12k £382.55k £912.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £88.13k £392.24k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.00k £1.80k £9.50k N/A £6.75k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.45k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £815.79k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £35.79k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £906.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.49k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0