Trustees HOME - START RUNNYMEDE AND WOKING

Charity number: 1128932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Parker Chair 23 November 2021
None on record
Joss Patterson Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
Gemma Niebieszczanski Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
David McKeown Trustee 15 January 2021
None on record
Trevor Pound Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
Jayne Skelton Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
JANICE BIBBY Trustee 01 January 2015
HOME-START SURREY
Received: On time
JOANNA MCKENZIE Trustee 03 November 2014
None on record
MICHAEL GRIFFITHS Trustee
None on record