BALSAM FAMILY PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education of the public in good practices promoting the maintenance and development of family welfare guided by the principles of the Christian Faith. To advance the Christian Faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statements of belief.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 29 May 2009: Standard registration
- 15 April 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.91k | £43.21k | £64.68k | £49.33k | £49.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.57k | £41.36k | £38.32k | £39.80k | £55.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £16.32k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 02 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 02 April 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 28 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 28 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 05 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 05 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GOOD PRACTICES PROMOTING THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF FAMILY WELFARE GUIDED BY THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window