IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE CHARITIES

Charity number: 1128929
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 729 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 729 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Annual return 31 March 2015 11 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 14 December 2015 On time