THE ROCK CHURCH

Charity number: 1130956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £131.11k £148.23k £127.62k £162.24k £186.25k
Total expenditure £133.11k £98.70k £112.43k £122.01k £139.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A