Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN ACADEMY OF OPTOMETRY AND OPTICS

Charity number: 1134105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 March 2021 145 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 December 2019 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 December 2019 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window