LONDON RUGBY LEAGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 25 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 07 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 07 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 07 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 29 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download