LONDON RUGBY LEAGUE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £329.68k £256.88k £141.35k £7.85k £2.08k
Total expenditure £330.75k £287.84k £198.43k £8.03k £3.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £92.19k £0 N/A N/A N/A