FLIGHTS FOR LIFE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide flights in vintage aircraft to children and young adults who are undergoing treatment for serious illness or life shortening conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 May 2009: Standard registration
- 02 May 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 May 2024: Funds transferred to 504913 THE LINKAGE COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED
- 02 May 2024: Funds transferred to 512922 STRUT LIMITED
- 02 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1053814 ST BARNABAS HOSPICE TRUST (LINCOLNSHIRE)
- 02 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1198400 THE CLOTHING BANK
- 02 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1017501 Lincolnshire and Nottinghamshire Air Ambulance Cha...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93k | £592 | £3.98k | £762 | £153 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.57k | £4.10k | £3.43k | £1.94k | £1.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF TERMINALLY ILL OR SICK CHILDREN, AND CHILDREN WITH LIFE-SHORTENING ILLNESSES PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FLIGHTS IN VINTAGE AIRCRAFT WITH THE AIM OF ENHANCING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. ANY SUCH OTHER PURPOSES DEEMED CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window