Accounts and annual returns ACADEMY FM FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1137248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window