Financial history ACADEMY FM FOLKESTONE

Charity number: 1137248
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £112.34k £119.26k £126.48k £100.46k £131.06k
Total expenditure £121.29k £117.39k £114.44k £100.28k £117.30k
Income from government contracts £12.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.10k £5.00k £10.00k £17.50k £10.00k