EDUCATION WEST AFRICA

Charity number: 1130223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALYSON HEATH Trustee 08 October 2015
THE LITTLE BOOKWORMS LIMITED Overdue by 87 days
CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT WORK Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PULBOROUGH Received: On time
CHURCH SCHOOLMASTERS AND SCHOOLMISTRESSES' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION Received: On time
Hannah Turner Trustee 22 January 2020 None on record
Martin Lloyd Trustee 26 January 2017 None on record
MICHAEL WILSON Trustee 08 April 2013 None on record
Amanda Healey Trustee 14 May 2014 None on record
ERICA PENELOPE SHARMAN Chair None on record
MR ROD SHARMAN Trustee None on record