Financial history THEATRE IN THE QUARTER

Charity number: 1129316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £116.47k £131.90k £47.34k £29.89k £15.67k
Total expenditure £113.04k £99.72k £67.12k £17.56k £26.98k
Income from government contracts £12.00k £12.00k N/A N/A £5.00k
Income from government grants £8.85k £22.30k £14.00k £10.00k £5.00k