KING'S COLLEGE LONDON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £5.77m £6.42m £7.09m £8.96m £9.98m
Total expenditure £5.59m £6.66m £7.15m £8.83m £10.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.91m £4.19m £4.60m £6.01m £7.37m
Income - Other trading activities £319.15k £484.09k £571.65k £650.62k £424.40k
Income - Charitable activities £1.39m £1.74m £1.91m £2.29m £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.65k £5.01k £5.98k £8.96k £8.56k
Income - Other £147.82k £0 £0 £0 £291.69k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.31m £6.09m £6.77m £8.33m £9.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £281.90k £285.17k £341.28k £473.14k £408.72k
Expenditure - Governance £38.87k £0 £43.24k £0 £26.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £292.87k £38.07k £27.67k £355.23k