KING'S COLLEGE LONDON STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1136729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Ann Clarke Trustee 31 October 2019 None on record
Amy Saskia Lock Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Nazreen Visram Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Hamza Lone Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
SONIKA SIDHU Trustee 05 November 2015 None on record
Rebecca Jessica Seling Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Abdus Saboor Shaik Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Marcus Lee Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Hania Hussain Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Gul-E-Zahra Syed Chair 28 July 2021 None on record
Zayna Zahid Aslam Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Muhammad Arslan Zafar Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Muhammed Daniyal Ubaidullah Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record
Fatimah Patel Trustee 28 July 2021 None on record