PANCHAMUKHEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation organises various cultural events to promote its objcetives and any surplus funds are directed towards assisitng other charities sharing the same ideology. The key objcetive of Panchamukhee is to promote the arts and cultural heritage of the Indian subcontinent and explore how different people and cultures can work together in the present multicultural and multi ethnic U.K.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 02 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joydeep Mukherjee | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Subrata Chowdhury | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KAVITA BASU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.12k | £21.89k | £4.44k | £15.13k | £16.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.46k | £21.60k | £3.82k | £15.62k | £13.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 August 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 June 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ASIAN COMMUNITY IN HARROW AND WEST LONDON AS THE COMMITTEE DETERMINES FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR, IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC (IN PARTICULAR TRADITIONAL ASIAN MUSIC), DRAMA AND DANCE; (B) PROMOTING THE ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; (C) ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ASIAN CULTURE IN PARTICULAR RAISING CULTURAL AWARENESS IN ASIAN FESTIVALS; (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN INDIA AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
HARROW AND WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 Headstone Lane
HARROW
HA2 6JL
- Phone:
- 02084587244
- Email:
- info@panchamukhee.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window