Financial history BOSCO SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 1129588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £772.24k £760.13k £880.34k £1.10m £910.09k
Total expenditure £718.60k £774.10k £895.05k £953.45k £861.85k
Income from government contracts N/A £246.42k £276.79k £483.83k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £39.12k £483.83k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.16k £2.34k £4.19k £2.21k £1.43k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £766.89k £757.59k £559.70k £1.10m £908.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £197 £197 £536 £654 £125
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.16k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £718.60k £774.10k £895.05k £947.93k £858.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.56k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £5.52k £0