LTS ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 August 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 August 2020 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 21 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required