RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT

Charity number: 1134387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Rendell Trustee 26 October 2021 None on record
Rena Rani Trustee 11 August 2020
BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Raman Dhillon Chair 12 December 2017
BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Faye Downs Trustee 29 May 2020 None on record
NIGEL BURBIDGE Trustee 01 February 2013
TRADE SEXUAL HEALTH Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
Rachel Scott Trustee 12 December 2017
BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time
SALLY PLUMB Trustee
BIRMINGHAM RAPE AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE PROJECT Received: On time