Accounts and annual returns THE JULIAN BREAM TRUST

Charity number: 1130890
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window