THE EUROPEAN MYASTHENIA GRAVIS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is working as an umbrella organisation for national associations of people with the Myasthenia Gravis disease.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Albania
- Andorra
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Romania
- Russia
- San Marino
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Ukraine
Governance
- 22 July 2009: Standard registration
- 18 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £668 | £389 | £163 | £428 | £906 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.63k | £2.91k | £584 | £2.32k | £5.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 22 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 25 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 17 February 2017 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF SUFFERERS FROM MYASTHENIA GRAVIS, LAMBERT-EATON MYASTHENIC SYNDROME, CONGENITAL MYASTHENIC SYNDROME AND OTHER SIMILAR DISEASES OF THE HUMAN NEUROMUSCULAR JUNCTION IN THE COUNTRIES OF CONTINENTAL EUROPE.
Area of benefit
CONTINENTAL EUROPE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window