SRI LANKAN MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF EAST LONDON

Charity number: 1131486
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £64.36k £68.73k £38.91k £240.77k £131.05k
Total expenditure £10.82k £7.69k £10.36k £14.79k £27.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A