CHILDREN FIRST UGANDA

Charity number: 1130627
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.50k £17.87k £15.66k £15.88k £13.27k
Total expenditure £26.37k £17.32k £16.66k £16.66k £11.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A