NORWICH CHRISTIAN RESOURCES

Charity number: 1135412

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET HELENA JOAN SMITH Trustee 17 February 2014
NORWICH YOUTH FOR CHRIST Received: On time
PHILIP JAMES TALBOT Chair 27 April 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, CRINGLEFORD Received: On time
Rev Heather Dawn Butcher Trustee 12 January 2021 None on record
Rev Alaric Lewis Trustee 11 March 2019
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN PETTUS AND OTHERS Received: On time
Rev Neil Walker Trustee 30 October 2017
FOULSHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time