WARSASH (NO. 636) UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 1129819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £21.75k £26.47k £23.87k £32.42k £9.92k
Total expenditure £12.17k £23.63k £25.83k £34.59k £5.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A