THE REACH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £30.00k £385.00k £5.34m
Total expenditure £0 £0 £16.25k £380.00k £3.11m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.21m
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £965.14k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.38m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0