BODIAM PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The nursery provides high quality childcare for families in the local area of Bodiam and surrounding villages, which enable working parents to pursue employment and full time careers to ensure that their children acquire social skills and pre school education essential to their development in a safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £46,521 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 May 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Stevens | Chair | 23 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Louise Greenfield | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsey Anne Willard | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOWARD BARNETT | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Philippa Sylvia Grace Fishlock | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Katie Jane Hodgson-Martin | Trustee | 23 August 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.00k | £48.60k | £47.04k | £65.99k | £65.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.50k | £44.00k | £48.38k | £58.58k | £62.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.00k | £35.00k | £33.00k | £43.72k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 April 2025 | 67 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 April 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 358 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
2.1 THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES ARID PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS;
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bodiam Pre School
Bodiam
ROBERTSBRIDGE
East Sussex
TN32 5UJ
- Phone:
- 01580830203
- Email:
- bodiampreschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window