FANT COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1132134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision & maintenance of Community Hall for use of the inhabitants of Fant & Surrounding Areas without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions, including use for: Meetings, lectures & classes, Other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the inhabitants. Do anything that is lawful which will help to fulfil its aim.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £22,354
Total expenditure: £34,061

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 October 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHARON MANSFIELD Chair
None on record
david charles kennard Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
larraine kennard Trustee
None on record
DARREN JAMES MANSFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.52k £24.89k £24.95k £24.85k £22.35k
Total expenditure £21.01k £21.64k £19.97k £24.04k £34.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.75k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FANT COMMUNITY HALL
FANT LANE
MAIDSTONE
ME16 8NN
Phone:
01622728308