LADY SUMAYYA HUMANITARIAN AID FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1133281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

a)The relief of financial hardship. b)The advancement of education, particularly amongst children who are disabled or who have special educational needs. c)The relief and assistance of people an any part of the world who are victims of war or natural disaster, trouble, or catastrophe

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £251,259
Total expenditure: £197,220

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Harrow
  • Hertfordshire
  • Ghana
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Tanzania
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 December 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MUSLIM KHOJA Chair
G F FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
KHOJA SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time
KHOJA SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI MUSLIM COMMUNITY (BAQUIR) LIMITED
Received: On time
NAZIR RUMANI Trustee 08 August 2024
None on record
RIYAZ HUSEIN LADAK Trustee
None on record
MUSLIM DHARAMSHI Trustee
None on record
MR M. B. BHARWANI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £196.88k £470.81k £345.54k £289.18k £251.26k
Total expenditure £205.64k £380.47k £272.94k £231.07k £197.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
176 LOZELLS ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B19 2SX
Phone:
01215544566
Website:

Ladysumayya.org