Financial history THE BARHAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1129728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £81.86k £42.60k £62.61k £73.78k £59.22k
Total expenditure £75.92k £42.98k £75.09k £80.36k £58.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A