KGV COTTINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1130233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £119.81k £111.96k £95.13k £92.90k £90.00k
Total expenditure £121.32k £89.81k £74.72k £77.75k £76.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £25.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £0 £22.00k £18.00k £16.00k