KGV COTTINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a sporting and recreation facility for the residents of Cottingham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALICIA MAIL | Chair | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROBERT GIBSON | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richardson | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Burns | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sam Winter | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEPH JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.00k | £99.65k | £80.82k | £79.52k | £68.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.40k | £59.18k | £73.47k | £70.68k | £60.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £11.00k | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.00k | £63.59k | £15.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COTTINGHAM HULL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A LEISURE CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE WOODLAND AREA AND WILDLIFE FIELD ADJOINING THE LEISURE CENTRE D) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF COTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT
Area of benefit
COTTINGHAM HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cottingham Sports Centre
King George V Playing Fields
Northgate
COTTINGHAM
HU16 5QW
- Phone:
- 01482840290
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window