KGV COTTINGHAM COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1130233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALICIA MAIL Chair 19 November 2012 None on record
Sam Winter Trustee 07 January 2019 None on record
Paul Andrew Burns Trustee 13 January 2020 None on record
DAVID JOSEPH JACKSON Trustee None on record
Dylan Karl Medini Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record
Mark Richardson Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Richard Hewitt Trustee 10 February 2020 None on record