Accounts and annual returns THE EAST MANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1131060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window