THE COLLEGE OF ALL SOULS OF THE FAITHFUL DEPARTED, OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1138057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 22 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 24 February 2017 On time Download