THE COLLEGE OF ALL SOULS OF THE FAITHFUL DEPARTED, OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1138057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £15.09m £12.17m £12.65m £13.98m £12.85m
Total expenditure £9.66m £9.66m £9.65m £12.22m £8.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £262.00k £276.00k £290.00k £273.24k £535.44k
Income - Donations and legacies £26.00k £54.00k £112.00k £67.00k £8.17k
Income - Other trading activities £3.58m £69.00k £62.00k £164.71k £49.97k
Income - Charitable activities £631.00k £615.00k £692.00k £605.63k £536.48k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.17m £11.25m £11.34m £13.13m £11.62m
Income - Other £685.00k £182.00k £445.00k £12.07k £639.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £20.00k £92.60k £61.07k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.98m £8.64m £8.59m £11.00m £7.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.68m £1.01m £1.06m £1.22m £1.25m
Expenditure - Governance £33.00k £31.00k £45.00k £24.23k £24.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.00k £107.00k £25.00k £10.85k £10.85k
Expenditure - Investment management £989.00k £931.00k £1.06m £1.22m £1.25m
Expenditure - Other £0 £9.00k £0 £0 £0