Financial history THE WARDEN AND SCHOLARS OF THE HOUSE OR COLLEGE OF SCHOLARS OF MERTON IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1139022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £13.36m £14.62m £13.79m £12.69m £13.85m
Total expenditure £13.77m £14.84m £17.32m £14.60m £16.97m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.98m £2.55m £1.47m £1.22m £2.65m
Income - Other trading activities £680.00k £1.00m £930.00k £526.00k £17.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.73m £4.89m £4.97m £4.47m £4.64m
Income - Endowments £1.24m £980.00k £715.00k £479.00k £1.48m
Income - Investment £5.98m £6.17m £6.42m £6.11m £6.34m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £366.00k £198.00k
Income - Legacies £141.00k £250.00k £54.13k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.63m £12.27m £14.07m £12.29m £14.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.54m £1.74m £2.41m £1.92m £2.13m
Expenditure - Governance £25.00k £25.00k £24.00k £24.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £11.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £941.00k £1.15m £1.71m £1.38m £1.64m
Expenditure - Other £603.00k £825.00k £850.00k £392.00k £14.00k