ST ANNE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1142660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 03 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 02 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 14 August 2017 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 14 August 2017 75 days late Download