WOLFSON COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1141446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

54 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Jonathan WOLFF Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Timothy Mark Hitchens Trustee 01 May 2018
THE DAIWA ANGLO-JAPANESE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr Dominik Maschek Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL HARRISON Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL ROBERTS Trustee 09 February 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR JACOB DAHL Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR ZEYNEP YUREKLI-GORKAY Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Dr Nicola SMART Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR JULIE CURTIS Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR TARJE NISSEN-MEYER Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
Professor Ruben ANDERSSON Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
Professor Christopher WOODRUFF Trustee 01 August 2016 None on record
Emily Victoria Eastham Trustee 26 June 2017 None on record
PROFESSOR MARTIN GOODMAN Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Professor John Jeoffey LOWE Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR BETTINA LANGE Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR MORITZ RIEDE Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR NIKITA SUD Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID TAYLOR Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Professor Julie Genevieve Odile Leone Cosmidis Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR Matthew Rushworth Trustee 31 January 2019 None on record
Dr Yuhan Sohrab-Dinshaw Vevaina Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Dr PHILOMEN PROBERT Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR MATTHEW COSTA Trustee 26 May 2015 None on record
Dr IMRE BANGHA Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR PETER CHARLES STEWART Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
Professor Loren Brett LANDAU Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR JONATHAN BARRETT Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
Dr Huw Thomas David Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Dr JAMES LEWIS Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR SAMSON ABRAMSKY Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR JEREMY JOHNS Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTINA REDFIELD Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER HOWGEGO Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
RICHARD MORIN Trustee 16 December 2015 None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL JARVIS Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
PROFESSOR JAN FELLERER Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Professor Ulrike Roesler Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR DE MELO WOLFGANG Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
Dr Nayanika Mathur Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Professor Amato John GIACCIA Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PROFESSOR VLATKO VEDRAL Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Professor Alain Fouad George Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Professor David William RAY Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR ELLEKE BOEHMER Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR JONATHAN PILA Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR RICK SCHULTING Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Dr GERAINT JONES Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
Professor Jagdeep NANCHAHAL Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR FRANCES GARDNER Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR MARC VENTRESCA Trustee 14 April 2011 None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL AVEYARD Trustee 17 December 2013 None on record
Dr ERICA CHARTERS Trustee 14 April 2011
THE NAVY RECORDS SOCIETY Received: On time
PROFESSOR Linda Mulcahy Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record