THE WOO FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1131329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £26.92k £3.81k £5.12k £9.09k £18.40k
Total expenditure £15.51k £20.54k £7.24k £19.90k £15.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A