CHRIST FOUNDATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1129845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 02 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 13 December 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 13 December 2019 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 23 May 2019 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 05 December 2018 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 30 November 2018 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 15 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2016 02 December 2016 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 02 December 2016 2 days late Download