CHRIST FOUNDATION MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1129845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £45.01k £56.04k £56.04k £48.76k £47.09k
Total expenditure £42.58k £49.59k £49.59k £52.75k £44.62k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A