ACE - FRIENDS OF ST IVES CORN EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1132728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 February 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 08 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 24 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required