ACE - FRIENDS OF ST IVES CORN EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1132728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.36k £8.34k £7.68k £9.14k £5.40k
Total expenditure £12.80k £5.07k £7.63k £9.51k £3.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A