ACE - FRIENDS OF ST IVES CORN EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1132728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JASON GREEN Trustee 26 June 2018 None on record
IAN PAUL DOBSON Chair 02 September 2011
NOBLES FIELD RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
ROB ZANCONATO Trustee 09 August 2012 None on record
JAN DOBSON Trustee None on record
DICK CHALKLEY Trustee 10 August 2012 None on record
Jade Catherine Olivia Hockie Trustee 30 September 2020
PARENTS AT WHEATFIELDS SCHOOL (PAWS) Received: On time
MARGARET TAYLOR Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
PHIL POPE Trustee 09 August 2012 None on record
PAULA MARIAN LUTER Trustee None on record