COTSWOLD DOWNS SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1134341
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)