Financial history COTSWOLD DOWNS SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1134341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.80k £17.10k £18.00k £10.43k £9.18k
Total expenditure £6.77k £9.72k £17.65k £9.29k £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.43k N/A