CANOLFAN MAERDY

Charity number: 1131506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 December 2020 07 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 07 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 07 December 2018 30 October 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 October 2019 23 days late Download
Annual return 07 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 December 2017 05 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 07 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 December 2016 06 October 2017 On time Download