THE HUMANITARIAN DIALOGUE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1136895
Charity reporting is up to date (87 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £101.62k £113.13k £109.84k £81.43k £55.02k
Total expenditure £95.45k £113.13k £112.35k £95.60k £50.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A